Manuel Acuña Roxas |
(January 1, 1892 – April 15, 1948)
Notable Achievements
1904: elementary education in Saint Joseph's College in Hong Kong
1917: a member of the municipal council of Capiz
1919 - 1922: became the youngest governor of Capiz
August 21, 1941 – December 29, 1941: Secretary of Finance
July 9, 1945 – May 25, 1946: Senator of the Philippines
July 9, 1945 – May 25, 1946: 2nd President of the Senate of the Philippines
May 28, 1946 – April 15, 1948: 5th President of the Philippines
|
|
The Hon. Eric Peter Ho 何鴻鑾先生 |
CBE, JP | Year in SJC : 1940
Notable Achievements
Former Member of the Executive Council of Hong Kong
Former Member of the Legislative Council of Hong Kong
Former Chairman of the Public Service Commission
Former Secretary for Trade and Industry
Former Secretary for Social Services
British Representative in the Sino British Liaison Group
Remarks
Honorary President of the Welfare League
|
|
Dr. Donald Liao Poon Huai 廖本懷先生 |
CBE, JP, Dsc | Year in SJC : 1950
Notable Achievements
Former Secretary for Housing
Former Head of Home Affairs Bureau
Remarks
His wife is 袁經錦 (a.k.a 毛妹)
|
|
Mr. Peter Tsao Kwang Yung 曹廣榮先生 |
CBE, CPM, JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1954
Notable Achievements
Former Secretary of Home Affairs
Former Secretary of Administrative Services and Information
|
|
Dr. Li Yuet Ting 李越挺博士 |
CBE, JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1955
Notable Achievements
Chairman of Man Kwan Education Fund
Former Director of Education
|
|
Mr. Jerry Lam Chek Yuen 林淔源先生 |
OBE, QFSM, CPM | Year in SJC : Class of 1955
Notable Achievements
Former Director of the Fire Services Department
|
|
Mr. Chau Tak Hay 周德熙先生
|
GBS, CBE, JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1961
Notable Achievements
Former Secretary for Trade and Industry
Former Secretary for Commerce and Industry
Former Secretary for Broadcasting, Culture and Sport
Former Secretary for Health and Welfare
Former Director for General of Trade
|
|
Mr. Paul Leung Sai Wah 梁世華先生 |
JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1966
Notable Achievements
Former Director of Leisure and Cultural Services
|
|
Mr. Isaac Chow Yiu Nam 鄒耀南先生 |
JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1969
Notable Achievements
Former Deputy Director of Government Logistics
|
|
Mr. Benjamin Tang Kwok Bun 鄧國斌先生 |
GBS | Year in SJC : Class of 1969
Notable Achievements
Member of Independent Commission Against Corruption - Operations Review Committee
Independent Non-Executive Director of the MTR Ltd
Former Director of Audit
|
|
The Hon. Paul Tang Kwok Wai 鄧國威先生
|
JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1973
Notable Achievements
Secretary for the Civil Service
Member of the Executive Council of Hong Kong
Permanent Secretary for Economic Development and Labour (Labour) and Commissioner for Labour
Former Director of Social Welfare
Permanent Secretary for Labour and Welfare until June 2012.
|
|
Mr. Peter Lau Ka Keung 劉家強先生 |
JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1974
Notable Achievements
Director of Highways
Former Director of Drainage Services
|
|
Mr. Edwin Tong Ka Hung 唐嘉鴻先生 |
JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1976
Notable Achievements
Director of Drainage Services
|
|
Mr. Wong Ho Yuen 黃灝玄先生 |
JP | Year in SJC : Class of 1977
Notable Achievements
Permanent Secretary for Financial Services and the Treasury Bureau (Financial Services)
Former Permanent Secretary for Commerce and Economic Development (Commerce, industry and Tourism)
Former Permanent Secretary for the Civil Service
Former Permanent Secretary for the Chief Executive’s Office
Former Director of Administration, Administration Wing, Chief Secretary for Administration’s Office
|
|